Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-09 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9851041) filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burbank, Renee) (Attachment 4 replaced on 2/10/2023) (zrtw). (Entered: 02/09/2023) |
2023-02-09 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Burbank, Renee) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/10/2023) (zrtw). (Entered: 02/09/2023) |
2023-02-10 | | Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zrtw) (Entered: 02/10/2023) |
2023-02-10 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 02/10/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM served on 2/21/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unsigned return receipt., # 2 Exhibit USPS tracking information.)(Burbank, Renee) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/22/23. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Signed return receipt.)(Burbank, Renee) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/24/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Signed return receipt.)(Burbank, Renee) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by John Haberland on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Haberland, John) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-21 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 8 Consent Motion to Extend Time. It is hereby ORDERED that, for good cause shown, Defendant's 8 consent motion for an extension of time to answer Plaintiffs' complaint is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by April 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/21/2023. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/21/2023) |
2023-03-21 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Kelley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kelley, Ryan) (Entered: 03/21/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |