Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER, DISTRICT OF NEVADA et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00382
Date Filed2023-02-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffFEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER, DISTRICT OF NEVADA
PlaintiffWESLEY PAUL COONCE, JR. Reg. No. 30011-039
Case DescriptionThe Federal Public Defender for the District of Nevada submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning Wesley Paul Coonce, a convicted murderer in federal prison who the Federal Defender's Office is representing on appeal of his conviction. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Federal Public Defender filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-091COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER, DISTRICT OF NEVADA, WESLEY PAUL COONCE, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons Attorney General, # 12 Summons BOP, # 13 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 14 Summons DOJ)(Bizzaro, Amelia) (Attachment 10 replaced on 2/10/2023) (zljn). (Entered: 02/09/2023)
2023-02-10Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zljn) (Entered: 02/10/2023)
2023-02-102SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 02/10/2023)
2023-02-163CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER, DISTRICT OF NEVADA . (Bizzaro, Amelia) (Entered: 02/16/2023)
2023-02-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/16/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/18/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/16/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 2/15/2023; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/16/2023. (See Docket Entry 3 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-02-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 2/17/2023; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/17/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/16/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/18/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/16/2023. (Bizzaro, Amelia) Modified docket event/text on 2/27/2023 (zed). (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-03-206Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 03/20/2023)
2023-03-21MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall now be due on or before April 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/21/2023. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/21/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar