Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00391
Date Filed2023-02-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerica First Legal Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning a number of issues. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and classified them as complex for processing purposes. AFL protested that designation and narrowed the scope of some requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AFL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-101COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9854688) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Civil Cover Sheet, # 26 Summons)(Block, Andrew) (Entered: 02/10/2023)
2023-02-13NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to andrew.block@aflegal.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. FOIA summons' required. (cb, ) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-02-132REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION.(Block, Andrew) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-02-13Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-02-133SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-02-134NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ding on behalf of AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-02-135STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/13/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-02-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/14/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/16/2023. (Block, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2023)
2023-03-087NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Kay Sowles on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
2023-03-088Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
2023-03-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before April 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/8/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar