Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHorton v. National Instant Criminal Background Check System
DistrictNorthern District of West Virginia
CityClarksburg
Case Number1:2023cv00018
Date Filed2023-02-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh
PlaintiffJohn D. Horton
Case DescriptionJohn Horton submitted a FOIA request to the National Instant Criminal Background Check System for records concerning himself. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Horton filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantNational Instant Criminal Background Check System
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-101COMPLAINT against National Instant Criminal Background Check System filed by John D. Horton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Envelope) (jb) (Entered: 02/10/2023)
2023-02-102** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John D. Horton. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (jb) (Entered: 02/10/2023)
2023-02-103NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM:RRR. (jb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2023: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jb). (Entered: 02/10/2023)
2023-02-214ORDER OF REFERRAL. The Court REFERS this action, to the Honorable Michael J. Aloi, United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct a scheduling conference and issue a scheduling order, for written orders or reports and recommendations, as the case may be, regarding any motions filed, and to dispose of any other matters that may arise. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 2/21/2023. (jb) Copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM:RRR. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2023: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jb). (Entered: 02/21/2023)
2023-02-225ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES [ECF NO. 2 ] AND DIRECTING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 2/22/2023. (jb) (Copy to Pro Se Plaintiff by CM:RRR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2023: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jb). (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-287MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE: Mail sent to John D. Horton [ECF NO. 3 ] Notice Returned as "Return to Sender/Not Deliverable as Addressed/Unable to Forward." (jb) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-03-018SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Instant Criminal Background Check System served on 3/1/2023. (jb) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-069Mail sent to John D. Horton 4 Order. Returned not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (snc) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-2310SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Instant Criminal Background Check System served on 3/16/2023. (jb) (Entered: 03/23/2023)
2023-03-2711PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS by John D. Horton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Envelope)(hrc) (Entered: 03/27/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar