Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE v. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00403
Date Filed2023-02-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE
Case DescriptionFunctional Government Initiative submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Trade Commission for records concerning the investigation of the meat and poultry industries. FGI also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency indicated that it could not respond within the 20 day time limit. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FGI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-131COMPLAINT against FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9857085) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons FTC Summons, # 3 Summons AG Summons, # 4 Summons US Atty Summons, # 5 Supplement Exhibit List, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 6)(Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-02-13Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zcb) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-02-132SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-03-163RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/2/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/1/2023. (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 03/16/2023)
2023-03-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General Mar. 8, 2023. (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 03/16/2023)
2023-03-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION served on 3/8/2023 (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 03/16/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar