Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00404
Date Filed2023-02-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice. CREW's first request was sent to the Executive Office of U.S. Attorneys. The second FOIA request was sent to the Office of Information Policy, and the third request was sent to the FBI. All three requests sought records concerning statement made by former President Donald Trump that he had ordered DOJ personnel to participate in the 2018 election. CREW also asked for a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9857212) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-02-13NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to jgutman@law.gwu.edu, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zrtw, ) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-02-132CIVIL COVER SHEET by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON re 1 Complaint, filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON.(Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/13/2023)
2023-02-14ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrtw) Modified on 2/14/2023 to correct judge assignment (zrtw). (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-14Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zrtw) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-03-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/23/2023 (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/23/2023. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/23/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/25/2023. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar