Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-13 | 1 | COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17076008). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Texas Public Policy Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swartz, Alexis) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-13 | 2 | NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Lawrence Disher on behalf of Texas Public Policy Foundation. Attorney Todd Lawrence Disher added to party Texas Public Policy Foundation(pty:pla) (Disher, Todd) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-13 | 3 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Texas Public Policy Foundation. (Swartz, Alexis) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-13 | | Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn) (Entered: 02/14/2023) |
2023-02-13 | | If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (rn) (Entered: 02/15/2023) |
2023-02-15 | 4 | Summons Issued as to Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rn) (Entered: 02/15/2023) |
2023-02-15 | 5 | MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexis Swartz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17087294) by Michael B. Schon on behalf of Texas Public Policy Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Swartz, Alexis) (Entered: 02/15/2023) |
2023-02-22 | 6 | ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael B. Schon. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 7 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas Public Policy Foundation. Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) served on 2/21/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Swartz, Alexis) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |