Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00414
Date Filed2023-02-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beryl A Howell
PlaintiffPROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.
Case DescriptionProject on Government Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Air Force for records concerning the report from A-10/F-35 Close Air Support Flyoff Tests conducted at the Marine Corps Air Station Yuma. POGO also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, POGO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-141COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9859588) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Dep't of Air Force, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-15Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zrtw) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-03-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/24/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/26/2023. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-035STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 3, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3-1-2023. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
2023-03-227Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/22/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar