Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInternational Refugee Assistance Project, Inc. v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv01236
Date Filed2023-02-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jennifer H. Rearden
PlaintiffInternational Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe International Refugee Assistance Project submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning manuals and database schema for RAD Global, ECN, RCM, CAMINO, R-TRACK and other case management software currently used or assessed by the agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. IRAP also submitted a FOIA request to the State Department for records concerning case management software used by the State Department. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from either agency, IRAP filed suit against both of them.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-141COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27341107)Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D).(Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-142FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Meyer, Kathryn) Modified on 2/15/2023 (pc). (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-143FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Meyer, Kathryn) Modified on 2/15/2023 (pc). (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-144FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Meyer, Kathryn) Modified on 2/14/2023 (lb). (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-145MOTION for Chris Opila to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27341650. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Chris Opila for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-14***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Kathryn Claire Meyer to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate disclosure statement was not signed;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-146AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-15CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-15Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-15Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-15***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kathryn Claire Meyer to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): second page is missing;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-15***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kathryn Claire Meyer to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; File each summons separately;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-157CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-158REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-159REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-15>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 5 MOTION for Chris Opila to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27341650. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-1610ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State..(pc) (Entered: 02/16/2023)
2023-02-1611ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(pc) (Entered: 02/16/2023)
2023-02-2712ORDER granting 5 Motion for Chris Opila to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden) (Text Only Order) (kwi) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-2713NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chris Opila on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Opila, Chris) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar