Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKRONICK v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00426
Date Filed2023-02-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffKATIE KRONICK
Case DescriptionKatie Kronick, an attorney and law professor, submitted six FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning medical records of people who were in BOP's custody. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Kronick filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-151COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9864402) filed by KATIE KRONICK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons Summons)(Davy, Jim) (Attachment 7 replaced on 2/16/2023) (zrtw). (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-16NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to jimdavy@allriselaw.org, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. No signature on civil cover sheet, 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zrtw, ) (Entered: 02/16/2023)
2023-02-162ERRATA signed civil cover sheet by KATIE KRONICK re 1 Complaint,. (Davy, Jim) (Entered: 02/16/2023)
2023-02-17Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zrtw) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-02-173ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) Modified on 2/24/2023 (zrtw). (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-03-014REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Corrected by KATIE KRONICK re 1 Complaint, 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA filed by KATIE KRONICK. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by KATIE KRONICK, 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Davy, Jim) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-025SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar