Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-16 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9867529) filed by REASON FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons BOP, # 3 Summons MAIN JUSTICE, # 4 Summons USAO, # 5 Summons OIP)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 02/16/2023) |
2023-02-17 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to dgolden@debgoldenlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsl, ) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-17 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET by REASON FOUNDATION re 1 Complaint, filed by REASON FOUNDATION. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by REASON FOUNDATION.(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-17 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsl) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-17 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS.(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by April 4, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/21/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/21/2023) |
2023-04-04 | 5 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-04-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 5 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by May 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 04/05/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/05/2023) |
2023-05-24 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 05/24/2023) |
2023-05-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by July 26, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/24/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/24/2023) |
2023-07-26 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-07-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the Court sets the following schedule for summary judgment briefing. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due by September 29, 2023; Plaintiff's Combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion is due by November 13, 2023; Defendants' Combined Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion is due by December 8, 2023; and Plaintiff's Reply is due by January 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/26/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-09-26 | 8 | Consent MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
2023-09-27 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the 8 Defendants' Consent Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing. The Court hereby stays all summary judgment briefing deadlines in this case. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report on or by November 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/27/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/27/2023) |
2023-11-27 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 11/27/2023) |
2023-11-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 9 parties' Joint Status Report, the Court sets the following schedule for summary judgment briefing. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due by January 25, 2024; Plaintiff's Combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion is due by February 22, 2024; Defendants' Combined Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion is due by March 21, 2024; and Plaintiff's Reply is due by April 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/28/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/28/2023) |
2024-01-24 | 10 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Christenson, # 3 Exhibits, # 4 Mortality Review - Ofume, # 5 Mortality Review - Nelson, # 6 Mortality Review - Circle-Bear, # 7 Mortality Review - Salas, # 8 Mortality Review - Blank Sample, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 01/24/2024) |
2024-02-22 | 11 | RESPONSE re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by REASON FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 02/22/2024) |
2024-02-22 | 12 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by REASON FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 02/22/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |