Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-16 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5946252), filed by Kenton C Crabb. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Request Ex. A)(Marshall, Clifford) (Entered: 02/16/2023) |
2023-02-16 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Scott Broome Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5946280. by Kenton C Crabb. (Marshall, Clifford) Motions referred to David Keesler: Modified to add referral on 2/17/2023 (nvc). (Entered: 02/16/2023) |
2023-02-17 | | Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the Case Assignment Packet . Motions referred to David Keesler: 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Scott Broome Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5946280. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (nvc) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-17 | | Clerk's Entry and Service of Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-17 | 3 | Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (nvc) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-23 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Gill Paul Beck, Sr on behalf of United States of America (Beck, Gill) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-02-23 | 5 | ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added J. Scott Broome for Kenton C Crabb (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF) . Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/23/23. (mga) NEF regenerated on 2/23/2023 (mga). (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-02-23 | | Notice to J. Scott Broome: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account Link . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/2/2023. **Note: Your contact information needs to be updated in ECF.** (mga) NEF regenerated on 2/23/2023 (mga). (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-03-10 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Sasarak on behalf of United States of America (Sasarak, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 7 | NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Sasarak, Stephanie) Modified text on 3/15/2023 (mek). (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 8 | Joint MOTION to Amend Case Caption and Stipulation regarding Deadlines by United States of America. Responses due by 3/28/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sasarak, Stephanie). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 9 | ORDER granting 8 parties' Joint Motion to Amend Case Caption and Stipulation regarding Deadlines. Amended Complaint due 3/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/14/23. (mga) Modified text on 3/14/2023 (mga). (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/14/2023) (mga). NEF regenerated on 3/14/2023 (mga). (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 3/15/2023. (mga) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 10 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, filed by Kenton C Crabb. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request)(Broome, J.) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |