Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00451
Date Filed2023-02-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffINFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK
Case DescriptionInformed Consent Action Network submitted two FOIA requests to the FDA for records concerning the dose determination for the Pfizer COVID-19 vaccine. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked ICAN to clarify the scope of its request, which it did. After hearing nothing further from the agency, ICAN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-171COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9871039) filed by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to FDA, # 3 Summons Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4)(Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-02-172MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aaron Siri, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9871075. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-02-173MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth A. Brehm, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9871076. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-02-174LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-02-21Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zcb) (Entered: 02/21/2023)
2023-02-215SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 02/21/2023)
2023-02-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice are DENIED. Given counsel's recent number of pro hac vice admissions, they should seek membership in this Court's bar. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/21/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/21/2023)
2023-03-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 2/27/2023 (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
2023-03-077RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/27/2023. (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
2023-03-078RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/24/2023. (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar