Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. NORIDIAN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS JE PART A
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00452
Date Filed2023-02-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted a FOIA request to Noridian Healthcare Solutions. Noridian did respond and the law firm filed suit. This is not a FOIA action because Noridian is not an agency.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantNORIDIAN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS JE PART A
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-171COMPLAINT for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against NORIDIAN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS JE PART A ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9871116) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons to Noridian Healthcare)(Reddick, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-02-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Reddick, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-02-21Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zcb) (Entered: 02/21/2023)
2023-02-213SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NORIDIAN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS JE PART A. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 02/21/2023)
2023-02-224REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney's Office for D.C. by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP.(Reddick, Nicholas) Modified on 2/27/2023 (znmw). Modified on 3/10/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-27ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 4 Request for Summons to Issue. Summonses cannot be issued for the U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; the defendant is not an agency of the United States.(znmw) Modified on 3/10/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-03-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to NORIDIAN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS JE PART A on 2/28/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Reddick, Nicholas) Modified on 3/10/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 03/09/2023)
2023-03-106SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
2023-03-207NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Bucher on behalf of NORIDIAN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS JE PART A (Bucher, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/20/2023)
2023-03-208NOTICE of Appearance by Lukman Segun Azeez on behalf of NORIDIAN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS JE PART A (Azeez, Lukman) (Entered: 03/20/2023)
2023-03-289Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer By March 30, 2023 by NORIDIAN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS JE PART A. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bucher, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/28/2023)
2023-03-30MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the 1 complaint by May 1, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/30/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/30/2023)
2023-05-0110Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NORIDIAN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS JE PART A. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bucher, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-02MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the 1 complaint by June 2, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/02/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/02/2023)
2023-06-0211Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by NORIDIAN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS JE PART A. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bucher, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/02/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar