Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCrabtree v. Mayorkas
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2023cv00745
Date Filed2023-02-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffKevin Michael Crabtree
Case DescriptionKevin Crabtree submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning what evidence established when the underlying benefit application is pending in Immigration Court. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Crabtree filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAlejandro Mayorkas
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-181COMPLAINT for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-18003713.). Filed byKevin Michael Crabtree. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USCIS Acknowledgement of FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Requestor's change of address and status inquiry, # 3 Exhibit USCIS email proposing to admnistratively close FOIA request, # 4 Exhibit Requestor's email expressing still interested in FOIA request, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 2/18/2023) (Entered: 02/18/2023)
2023-02-182Proposed Summons. (Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 2/18/2023) (Entered: 02/18/2023)
2023-02-213Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/7/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2023) (Entered: 02/21/2023)
2023-02-214***PLEASE DISREGARD - WRONG DOCUMENT*** Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2023) Modified on 3/3/2023 (jlg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/21/2023)
2023-02-215Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2023) (Entered: 02/21/2023)
2023-02-246CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Michael Crabtree.. (Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
2023-03-037Proposed Summons. (Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 3/3/2023) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-038Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2023) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar