Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLIAMS v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00401
Date Filed2023-02-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ana C. Reyes
PlaintiffALEXANDER WILLIAMS, JR.
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICES
DefendantCHARLOTTE LUCKSTONE
DefendantCHARLOTTE LUCKSTONE
TERMINATED: 05/08/2023
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-10Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 02/10/2023. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zcb) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-101COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zcb) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-102MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, JR. (zcb) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-213PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/21/2023. (zcb) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-03-134MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE by ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, JR (zcb) (Entered: 03/20/2023)
2023-03-135PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, JR (zcb) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-04-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 4 Plaintiff's letter to the Clerk of the Court and his attachments, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to provide a certified copy of his six-month prison account statement, see Order, Dkt. 4 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the statement by the proposed deadline of June 3, 2023, or risk dismissal of the case without prejudice. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/5/2023. (psu1) Modified to reflect correct Dkt. entry on 4/27/2023 (zcb). (Entered: 04/05/2023)
2023-04-246PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, JR (zcb) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-04-257NOTICE of EXHIBITS by ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(zcb) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-05-098ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $114.97 from Prison Account of Alexander Williams, Jr. and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/9/2023. (znmw) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-11Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (znmw) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-119SUMMONS (4) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; Sent to U.S. Marshals Service. (znmw) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/11/2023) (znmw). (Entered: 05/11/2023)
2023-05-1710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/16/2023; UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICES served on 5/17/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/16/2023. (ztth) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
2023-05-1711RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/16/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/15/2023. (ztth) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
2023-05-2412LEAVE TO FILE DENIED - Plaintiff's Letter. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "Leave to file denied as moot." Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 5/24/2023. (ztth) (Main Document 12 replaced on 5/24/2023) (ztth). (Entered: 05/24/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar