Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against United States Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27368037)Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Response, # 3 Exhibit Responsive Record).(Ranucci, Jessica) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ranucci, Jessica) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 3 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Education, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group..(Ranucci, Jessica) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 4 | RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group..(Ranucci, Jessica) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-22 | 5 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Education..(jgo) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-24 | 6 | SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Department of Education served on 2/24/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group..(Ranucci, Jessica) (Entered: 02/24/2023) |
2023-03-10 | 7 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Feldman Tarantolo on behalf of New York Legal Assistance Group..(Tarantolo, Danielle) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
2023-03-17 | 8 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Hilliard Dolinger on behalf of United States Department of Education..(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 03/17/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 9 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shanna Marie Tallarico on behalf of New York Legal Assistance Group..(Tallarico, Shanna) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |