Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBerlant v. US Election Assistance Commission
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2023cv00257
Date Filed2023-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Adrienne Nelson
PlaintiffShannon Berlant
Case DescriptionShannon Berlant submitted four FOIA requests to U.S. Election Assistance Commission for records concerning the most recent accreditation for the VSTL SLLC Compliance Division of Gaming Laboratories International. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Berlant filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Election Assistance Commission
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-211Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Receipt No. 101573. Summons issued as to US Election Assistance Commission. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Shannon Berlant against US Election Assistance Commission (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet). (kgc) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-212Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 6/21/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/21/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 7/21/2023. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 2/22/2023.) (kgc) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-213Summons Issued at Intake at the time of filing as to US Election Assistance Commission. (kgc) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-214Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Shannon Berlant. (kgc) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-275Return of Service Executed as to US Election Assistance Commission served on 2/21/2023, answer due on 3/23/2023. Service specifically made upon Attorney General Merrick Garland, U.S. Election Assitance Commission, U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia. (kgc) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-286ORDER - The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party, ECF 4 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-03-227Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael H. Simon to Judge Adrienne Nelson. (eo) (Entered: 03/22/2023)
2023-03-258Affidavit of Shannon Berlant . Filed by Shannon Berlant. (Related document(s): Complaint, 1 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Berlant, Shannon) (Entered: 03/25/2023)
2023-03-259Motion for Summary Judgment . Filed by Shannon Berlant. (Berlant, Shannon) (Entered: 03/25/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar