Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT against HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9878177) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-23 | | Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zljn) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-02-23 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-03-03 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 3, 2023. (lccjn2) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-23 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/23/2023) |
2023-03-27 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/27/2023) |
2023-04-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before April 28, 2023. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiffs; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiffs' requests and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiffs' request can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 5, 2023. (lccjn2) (Entered: 04/05/2023) |
2023-04-28 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/28/2023) |
2023-05-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the 6 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before June 2, 2023, and every 60 days thereafter until either Party moves for a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, files a dispositive motion, or the case is terminated. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 1, 2023. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/01/2023) |
2023-06-02 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/02/2023) |
2023-08-01 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/01/2023) |
2023-08-25 | 9 | MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redline Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Cornett, Eric) (Entered: 08/25/2023) |
2023-09-06 | 10 | MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/06/2023) |
2023-09-07 | 11 | RESPONSE re 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (znmw) (Entered: 09/07/2023) |
2023-09-29 | 12 | Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 13 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel)(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 14 | Memorandum in opposition to re 9 Motion for Leave to File, filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-11 | 15 | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AND REPLACE WITH REVISED OPPOSITION re 14 Memorandum in Opposition by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Revised Opposition, # 2 Exhibit B, Redlined Version of Opposition)(Johnson, Stephanie) Modified event on 10/13/2023 (mg). (Entered: 10/11/2023) |
2023-10-11 | 16 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AND REPLACE WITH REVISED OPPOSITION re 14 Memorandum in Opposition , 9 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 10/11/2023) |
2023-10-11 | 17 | DECLARATION of Samuel Everett Dewey by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL re 16 Reply to opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 10/11/2023) |
2023-10-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendant's 10 and 12 Motions for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 19, 2023. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/19/2023) |
2023-10-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Defendants 15 motion for leave to withdraw and replace its 14 opposition is GRANTED. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 19, 2023. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/19/2023) |
2023-10-24 | 18 | MOTION to Hold in Abeyance by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Cornett, Eric) (Entered: 10/24/2023) |
2024-02-09 | 19 | NOTICE by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL (Cornett, Eric) (Entered: 02/09/2024) |
2024-02-28 | 20 | ORDER denying 9 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 28, 2024. (lccjn2) (Entered: 02/28/2024) |
2024-03-09 | 21 | Consent MOTION for Scheduling Order by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 03/09/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |