Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00487
Date Filed2023-02-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the ham radio operator's license for Nellie Ohr, who worked for Fusion GPS when the company was hired by Hillary Clinton in 2016. Heritage Foundation also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request because it was too broad to search. The Heritage Foundation filed an administrative appeal. The agency granted the Heritage Foundation's appeal and remanded their request for a search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-221COMPLAINT against HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9878181) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-23Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zljn) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-232SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-233STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/23/2023. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-03-214NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/21/2023)
2023-03-275ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/27/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar