Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEverson v. United States Department of Justice et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv01456
Date Filed2023-02-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jennifer H. Rearden
PlaintiffSabrina Everson
Case DescriptionSabrina Everson, the mother of Bobby Everson, who died in federal prison, submitted a FOIA request to Department of Justice seeking records on her son's incarceration and death. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request entirely on the basis of Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Everson filed an administrative appeal. The Office of Information Policy denied Everson's appeal and she then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantUnited States Bureau of Prisons
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-221COMPLAINT against United States Bureau of Prisons, United States Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27373662)Document filed by Sabrina Everson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA req, # 2 Exhibit B - Ack Ltr, # 3 Exhibit C - F/U Email, # 4 Exhibit D - Resp to F/U Email, # 5 Exhibit E - 1st Adm Appeal, # 6 Exhibit F - Resp to 1st Adm Appeal, # 7 Exhibit G - Denial of 1st Adm Appeal, # 8 Exhibit H - 2nd Adm Appeal, # 9 Exhibit I - Denial of 2nd Adm Appeal).(Rankin, David) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-222CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rankin, David) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-223REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Sabrina Everson..(Rankin, David) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-224REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF PRISONS, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Sabrina Everson..(Rankin, David) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-225NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Regina Powers on behalf of Sabrina Everson..(Powers, Regina) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-23***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Bruce Rankin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the County code has been modified to Monroe. (vf) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-23CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-23Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-23Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-236ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice. (vf) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-237ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Bureau of Prisons. (vf) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-03-168SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. United States Department of Justice served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sabrina Everson..(Rankin, David) (Entered: 03/16/2023)
2023-03-169SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. United States Bureau of Prisons served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sabrina Everson..(Rankin, David) (Entered: 03/16/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar