Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReclaim the Records et al v. United States Department of State
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv01471
Date Filed2023-02-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jesse M. Furman
PlaintiffReclaim the Records
PlaintiffAlec Ferretti
Case DescriptionReclaim the Records submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning an index of all birth and death records held by the State Department for the Panama Canal Zone. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Reclaim the Records that its request was being processed but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Reclaim the Records filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-221COMPLAINT against United States Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27375317)Document filed by Reclaim the Records, Alec Ferretti. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA, # 2 Exhibit B - Ack Ltr, # 3 Exhibit C - Status 1, # 4 Exhibit D - Status 2, # 5 Exhibit E - Status 3, # 6 Exhibit F - Status 4, # 7 Exhibit G - Status 5, # 8 Exhibit H - Missing Data).(Rankin, David) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-222CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rankin, David) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-223REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alec Ferretti, Reclaim the Records..(Rankin, David) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-224NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Adams on behalf of Alec Ferretti, Reclaim the Records..(Adams, Katherine) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
2023-02-23***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Bruce Rankin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant);. (jgo) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-23CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-23Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-23Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-235ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State..(jgo) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-236ORDER: This case arises under the Freedom of Information Act, Title 5, United States Code, Section 552. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint letter, no later than two weeks from the date of this order and not to exceed two pages, indicating whether there is any need for discovery or an initial conference in this case. If there is no such need, the parties should include in their letter a proposed briefing schedule for any motions, including motions for summary judgment. If Defendant has not yet entered a notice of appearance, Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file proof of such service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/23/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-237NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey F Kinkle on behalf of Alec Ferretti, Reclaim the Records..(Kinkle, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-278NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Anthony Pantoja on behalf of United States Department of State..(Pantoja, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-279SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. United States Department of State served on 2/27/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by Reclaim the Records; Alec Ferretti..(Rankin, David) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-03-0710JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from AUSA Joseph A. Pantoja dated March 7, 2023 re: joint letter pursuant to 2/23/23 Order (ECF No. 6). Document filed by United States Department of State..(Pantoja, Joseph) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
2023-03-0811MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 10 Letter pursuant to 2/23/23 Order (ECF No. 6) filed by United States Department of State. ENDORSEMENT : Application GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended to May 26, 2023. SO ORDERED., (United States Department of State answer due 5/26/2023.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/7/23) (yv) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar