Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00488
Date Filed2023-02-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Energy Research submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, IEA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Defendant2255
FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-231COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9878192) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proposed to AG, US Attorney, and Defendant, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-232NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-24Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zrtw) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
2023-02-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
2023-03-164NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 03/16/2023)
2023-03-165NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 03/16/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar