Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00510
Date Filed2023-02-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmericans for Prosperity Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning emails from Secretary Mayorkas' personal email account to his official email account. AFPF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AFPF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9881762) filed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons USAO-DC Civil Process Clerk, # 11 Summons U.S. Att'y Gen., # 12 Summons Dep't of Homeland Sec.)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
2023-02-242LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
2023-02-27Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsl) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-274STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 27, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 2/28/2023 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-03-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/01/2023. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/27/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/29/2023. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar