Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOLDEN v. BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00521
Date Filed2023-02-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffDEBORAH M. GOLDEN
Case DescriptionDeborah Golden, an attorney who represents individuals in the custody of BOP, submitted three FOIA requests to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning her clients in the custody of BOP. Golden also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Golden filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-241COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF PRISONS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9884314) filed by Deborah Golden. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons BOP, # 3 Summons USAO, # 4 Summons USAG)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
2023-02-27NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to dgolden@debgoldenlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please resubmit your SIGNED cover sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (cb, ) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-272CIVIL COVER SHEET by DEBORAH M. GOLDEN re 1 Complaint filed by DEBORAH M. GOLDEN. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by DEBORAH M. GOLDEN.(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-28Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zcb) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar