Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLowe v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv01593
Date Filed2023-02-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Laura Taylor Swain
PlaintiffKevin Lowe
Case DescriptionKevin Lowe submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning his court case. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Lowe filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice Office of Information Policy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [2]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-241COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice. Document filed by Kevin Lowe. (sac) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-24Case Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-27NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-272ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 3/29/2023. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 3/29/2023. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/27/2023) (sha) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-28MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 2. Mailed to: Kevin Lowe 67 Chateau Drive Melville, NY 11747. (kh) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-03-083APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Kevin Lowe.(sc) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar