Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00528
Date Filed2023-02-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerica First Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request for records concerning the off-label use of puberty blockers and cross-sex hormones in children. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AFL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-271COMPLAINT against U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9885606) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-27Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsl) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-03-024STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 2, 2023. (lccjn3) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-075MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ian D. Prior, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9908528. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
2023-03-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/1/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/31/2023. (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
2023-03-077RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 3/1/2023 (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
2023-03-098RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/09/2023. (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar