Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMONEYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00541
Date Filed2023-02-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffMONEYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case DescriptionMoneygram International submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau of records concerning communications between the agency pertaining to Moneygram International and that involved various named public interest groups. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Moneygram International if it would narrow the scope of its request because the original search criteria was too broad and returned too many false hits. The agency provided a final response to Moneygram's request and withheld all the records under Exemption 5 (privileges),Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding) and Exemption 8 (bank examination records). Moneygram filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Moneygram filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-271COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9888599) filed by MONEYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons)(Wernick, Ephraim) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MONEYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Wernick, Ephraim) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-28Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-283SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-284STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/28/2023. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar