Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Newport Harbor v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CitySouthern Division - Santa Ana
Case Number8:2023cv00361
Date Filed2023-02-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John W. Holcomb
PlaintiffFriends of Newport Harbor
Case DescriptionFriends of Newport Harbor submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for records concerning the Confined Aquatic Disposal Facility and maintenance dredging projects in Newport Beach, California. Friends of Newport Harbor also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Newport Harbor filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Army Corps of Engineers
DefendantDoes 1-10
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-281COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34873590 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff friends of newport harbor. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit) (Attorney Jason Adam Cohen added to party friends of newport harbor(pty:pla))(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-03-012NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:23-cv-00361 JWH (DFMx). (lh) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-013NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-014NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-015Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-016NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect days for defendant to serve a response on Plaintiff entered. If the case is filed under the Freedom of Information Act, Within 30 days should be reflected on summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-017NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet and No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet (Summons) should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-028COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 02/28/2023, receipt number ACACDC-34873590), filed by plaintiff Friends of Newport Harbor.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-069STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar