Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00552
Date Filed2023-02-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning communications to or from Chris Krebs and other senior officials at the Cybersecurity Information Security Agency pertaining to four specific topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9890244) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Department of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons US Atty for DC, # 4 Summons US Atty General)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/1/2023) (zcb). (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-03-01Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zcb) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/3/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/2/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/08/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/7/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 03/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar