Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCoretti v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection et al
DistrictNorthern District of New York
CitySyracuse Plattsburgh
Case Number8:2023cv00267
Date Filed2023-02-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David N. Hurd
PlaintiffLuigi Coretti
Case DescriptionLuigi Coretti submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning an incident in which he was detained at the U.S./Canadian border. The agency acknowledged of the request and provided Coretti with three heavily redacted pages. Coretti's attorney had further discussions with agency but did not file an administrative. Coretti then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantJohn Doe Agency #1 - through John Doe Agency #10
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-281COMPLAINT against John Doe Agency #1 - through John Doe Agency #10, U.S. Customs and Border Protection (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6214348) filed by Luigi Coretti. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2023: # 11 Redacted Exhibit A, # 12 Redacted Exhibit B, # 13 Redacted Exhibit C, # 14 Redacted Exhibit G) (khr, ). (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-012Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Summons issued as to US Attorney)(khr) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-013G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/30/2023 10:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/23/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-01TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe Agency #1 through #10 defendants in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summons(es) for service of process on a John Doe Agency #1 through #10 defendants at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the John Doe Agency #1 through #10 defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant(s) pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons(es) will be issued at that time. (khr) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-01TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Luigi Coretti regarding the 1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has checked off Jury Demand on the Civil Cover Sheet, but the Jury Demand is not noted in the Pleading, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 38. Failure to file a Demand for Jury Trial pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 38 constitutes a waiver of a jury trial. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 3/6/2023 (khr) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-01TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Luigi Coretti regarding the 1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summons(es) were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. need a summons for U.S. Customs and Border Protection Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 3/6/2023 (khr) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-01TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Luigi Coretti regarding the 1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has submitted documents that are not in compliance with redaction requirements pursuant to Federal and NYND Local Rules 5.2 Personal Privacy Protection and General Order 22, Section 11.2. This document has been TEMPORARILY RESTRICTED. Counsel is directed to make the appropriate redactions to the above referenced document and electronically file the redacted document within 3 days of this notice using the event CORRECTED DOCUMENT(S) found under Other Filings and reference this case number. Do NOT use any other event to file your corrected document. Failure to file a redacted document by the deadline will result in the unredacted document referenced above being unrestricted. Counsel and the parties are cautioned that failure to redact these personal identifiers may subject them to the Courts full disciplinary power pursuant to NYND Local Rule 5.2. Exhibits A, B, C and G contain birth dates Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 3/6/2023 (khr) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-024REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Luigi Coretti is requesting summons(es) be issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection re: 1 Complaint,. (Marino, Charles) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-035Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (khr) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-03CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re 1 Complaint: Redacted copies of attachments # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit G have been uploaded and attached to Docket # 1 . The unredacted copies of Exhibits A, B, C, G are now permanently restricted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 5.2 NYND Local Rule 5.2 (khr) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-036AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief with Exhibits A- I and Civil Cover Sheet via Certified Mail served on Office of Chief Counsel, U.S. Customs and Border Protection on March 3, 2023, filed by Luigi Coretti. (Marino, Charles) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-037AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief with Exhibits A - I and Civil Cover Sheet via Certified Mail served on United States Attorney General Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Department of Justice on March 3, 2023, filed by Luigi Coretti. (Marino, Charles) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-06***Answer due date updated for U.S. Customs and Border Protection answer due 5/2/2023. (khr) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-068REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Luigi Coretti is requesting summons(es) be issued as to John Doe Agency #1 - through John Doe Agency #10 re: 1 Complaint,,. (Marino, Charles) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar