Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00566
Date Filed2023-03-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case Description1. Judicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to Department of Defense for records concerning the investigation referred to in the DOD IG report on p. 42 of its report to Congress in 2020. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-03-011COMPLAINT against JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9893156) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Defense, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Nobile, T. Russell) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-01Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zljn) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-012SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-153RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/13/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/12/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/8/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/8/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Nobile, T. Russell) (Entered: 03/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar