Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00577
Date Filed2023-03-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications concerning the Obama-Biden era classified records from October 25, 2022 to November 16, 2022. The Heritage Foundation also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-03-021COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9898371) filed by MIKE HOWELL, HERITAGE FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-03Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zljn) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar