Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00581
Date Filed2023-03-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerica First Legal Foundation submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning the Office of Refugee Resettlement care for unaccompanied alien children. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AFL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-03-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9897865) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-022REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION.(Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-023LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-03Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-034SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-035STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/3/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-156NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Block on behalf of AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Block, Andrew) (Entered: 03/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar