Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00589
Date Filed2023-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning communications sent to or from NARA concerning the Obama-Biden classified records. The Heritage Foundation requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and provided the Heritage Foundation with a partial response that included 74 pages with redactions under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). The Heritage Foundation concluded the response did not constitute a determination under FOIA and declined to file an administrative appeal, filing suit instead.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-03-031COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9901217) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-06Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsl) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-062STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/6/2023. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar