Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES v. CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00590
Date Filed2023-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ana C. Reyes
PlaintiffENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionEnergy Policy Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Product Safety Commission for records concerning email correspondence of two CPSC officials. EPA also requested a fee waiver. The agency did not acknowledge receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION
Defendant2255
CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-03-031COMPLAINT against CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9900580) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to AG, USAO, and Agency Counsel)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-052NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 03/05/2023)
2023-03-06Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zsl) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar