Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALEXANDER DIANOPOLIS v. UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00592
Date Filed2023-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffALEXANDER DIANOPOLIS
Case DescriptionAlexander Dianopolis, an USMS agent, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Marshals Service for records concerning his integrity reviews, which were cited for the reason the agency had decided to terminate his position. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Dianopolis that it was processing his request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Dianopolis filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-03-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9900680) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAG, # 3 Summons USAO, # 4 Summons USMS)(Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-06Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zcb) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-062SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-143RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/9/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/8/2023. (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
2023-03-144RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/09/2023. (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
2023-03-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE served on 3/9/2023 (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
2023-04-106NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 04/10/2023)
2023-04-107ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE.(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 04/10/2023)
2023-04-11MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by April 25, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/11/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/11/2023)
2023-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/25/2023 (lsj) (Entered: 04/11/2023)
2023-04-218Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 8 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by June 26, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/21/2023. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/26/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar