Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-03-03 | 1 | COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9901071) filed by ABBVIE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel A. Rosen, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit I to the Declaration of Daniel A. Rosen, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit II to the Declaration of Daniel A. Rosen, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-03 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ABBVIE INC. (Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-03 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zljn) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-03 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 4 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert H. Albaral, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9916127. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ABBVIE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Robert H. Albaral, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 5 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel A. Rosen, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9916137. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ABBVIE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel A. Rosen, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 6 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brendan J. Sponheimer, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9916144. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ABBVIE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Brendan J. Sponheimer, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/6/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/5/2023. (Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 3/6/2023 (Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert H. Albaral is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/14/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel A. Rosen is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/14/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brendan J. Sponheimer is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/14/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-16 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/10/2023. (Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/16/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Albaral on behalf of ABBVIE INC. (Albaral, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Rosen on behalf of ABBVIE INC. (Rosen, Daniel) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 12 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Rosen on behalf of ABBVIE INC. (Rosen, Daniel) Modified on 3/21/2023 correctly filed at entry 13 (zjm). (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 13 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Sponheimer on behalf of ABBVIE INC. (Sponheimer, Brendan) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |