Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv01854
Date Filed2023-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Katherine Polk Failla
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted FOIA requests to the CIA, the Department of State and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning briefings requested by former presidents since 1953. The agencies all acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Savage and the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
DefendantDepartment of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-03-031COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27420463)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-032FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) Modified on 3/6/2023 (pc). (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-033REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-034FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) Modified on 3/6/2023 (pc). (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-035REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-066RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-06CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-06Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-06Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-06***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David Edward McCraw to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): civil cover sheet was not signed;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-06***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Edward McCraw to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name does not match complaint caption title (U.S. Department of State);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-067ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency..(pc) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-068ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(pc) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-069CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-0610REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-0711ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of State..(pc) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
2023-03-1312NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/6/2023 at 12:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/13/2023) (jca) (Entered: 03/13/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar