Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title(PS) Rossington et al v. Mountain Circle Family Service, Inc., et al
DistrictEastern District of California
CitySacramento
Case Number2:2023cv00423
Date Filed2023-03-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller
PlaintiffShauna Rossington
PlaintiffAlex Rossington
PlaintiffAiden Rossington
PlaintiffJoseph Coddington
PlaintiffValerie Peters
DefendantMountain Circle Family Service, Inc.
Doing business as Sierra Nevada Connections
DefendantJustin Miller
DefendantPamela Crespin
DefendantKatherine Van Dolsen
DefendantAngie Carpenter
DefendantRobin Miller
DefendantShannon Doung
DefendantRobert Berry
DefendantBill Powers
DefendantKacey Reynolds
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [34]
Opinion/Order [48]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-03-071NOTICE of REMOVAL from Butte County Superior Court, case number 23CV00288 by Mountain Circle Family Service, Inc., et al. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10734616) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stern, Heather) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
2023-03-082[DISREGARD - ISSUED IN ERROR] CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/3/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP) (Perdue, C.) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
2023-03-08[DISREGARD - ISSUED IN ERROR] SERVICE BY MAIL: 2 Civil New Case Documents for WBS served on Joseph Coddington, Valerie Peters, Aiden Rossington, Alex Rossington, Shauna Rossington. (Perdue, C.) Modified on 3/8/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 03/08/2023)
2023-03-083CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION: DISREGARD 2 Civil New Case Documents for WBS. Issued in error. TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
2023-03-084CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form) (Perdue, C.) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
2023-03-085PROOF OF SERVICE of 4 New Case Documents and [DISREGARD - TO BE REFILED] - Consent/Decline Form by Mountain Circle Family Service, Inc. (Stern, Heather) Modified on 3/10/2023 (Perdue, C.). (Entered: 03/08/2023)
2023-03-086MOTION to DISMISS by Mountain Circle Family Service, Inc., et al., Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Stern, Heather) Modified on 3/10/2023 (Perdue, C.). (Entered: 03/08/2023)
2023-03-147CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kohls, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
2023-03-148MOTION to STRIKE by Robert Berry. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Redding before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Robert Berry, # 3 Exhibit Table of Evidence)(Kohls, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
2023-03-149MOTION to DISMISS by Robert Berry. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Redding before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Points and Authorities)(Kohls, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
2023-03-1410NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sonja M. Dahl on behalf of Angie Carpenter, et al. Attorney Dahl, Sonja M. added. (Dahl, Sonja) Modified on 3/16/2023 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 03/14/2023)
2023-03-2411MOTION to REMAND by Shauna Rossington, et al., Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2023 at 10:30 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Licea Chavez, V) Modified on 3/31/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 03/28/2023)
2023-03-2713CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benson, A.) Modified on 3/31/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 03/31/2023)
2023-03-2714CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/31/2023)
2023-03-2715CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/31/2023)
2023-03-2912MOTION to AMEND the Complaint by Shauna Rossington, et al., Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Licea Chavez, V) Modified on 3/31/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 03/30/2023)
2023-03-2935FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs (filed per 34 Order). (Benson, A.) (Entered: 04/14/2023)
2023-03-3016MOTION to AMEND 11 Motion to Remand by Shauna Rossington, et al., Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Benson, A.) Modified on 4/14/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 03/31/2023)
2023-03-3118CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/04/2023)
2023-03-3119CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/04/2023)
2023-03-3120CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/04/2023)
2023-03-3121CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/04/2023)
2023-04-0417MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Palmer for Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 04/04/23: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend, ECF No. 12, served on March 28, 2023, and amended motion to remand, ECF No. 16, served on March 29, 2023, and noticed for hearing before the Hon. Dennis M. Cota on April 19, 2023, are defectively noticed. Pursuant to Eastern District of California Local Rule 230(b), motions may not be set for hearing on a date which is fewer than 35 days after the motion is served. The hearing on the original motion to remand, ECF No. 11, set for September 6, 2023, is vacated. Plaintiffs shall re-notice these motions for the next available hearing date before Judge Cota, which is June 7, 2023, at 10:00 a.m., in Redding, California. (Text Only Entry)(Palmer, J) (Entered: 04/04/2023)
2023-04-04SERVICE BY MAIL: 17 Minute Order served on Joseph Coddington, Valerie Peters, Aiden Rossington, Alex Rossington, and Shauna Rossington. (Palmer, J) (Entered: 04/04/2023)
2023-04-0422CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/04/2023)
2023-04-0423REPLY by Angie Carpenter, et al., re 6 Motion to Dismiss. Attorney Dahl, Sonja M. added. (Dahl, Sonja) Modified on 4/7/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 04/04/2023)
2023-04-0540OPPOSITION by All Plaintiffs to 8 Motion to Strike and 9 Motion to Dismiss. (Benson, A.) Modified on 5/10/2023 (Donati, J). (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-04-0624NOTICE TO RESCHEDULE MOTION HEARING re 6 Motion to Dismiss by Mountain Circle Family Service, Inc., et al., Motion Hearing RESET for 6/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Stern, Heather) Modified on 4/7/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 04/06/2023)
2023-04-0625CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Mountain Circle Family Service, Inc. re 6 Motion to Dismiss. (Stern, Heather) (Entered: 04/06/2023)
2023-04-0628CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/10/2023)
2023-04-0629CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E) (Main Document 29 replaced on 4/12/2023) (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 04/10/2023)
2023-04-0726REPLY and NOTICE of NO RECEIPT of OPPOSITION by Robert Berry re 8 Motion to Strike. (Kohls, Daniel) Modified on 4/7/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 04/07/2023)
2023-04-0727REPLY by Robert Berry to Untimely Opposition re 8 Motion to Strike. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel F. Kohls)(Kohls, Daniel) Modified on 4/7/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 04/07/2023)
2023-04-1031NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by all Plaintiffs. (Licea Chavez, V) (Entered: 04/11/2023)
2023-04-1130REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC/REMOTE APPEARANCE at the 4/19/2023 Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint hearing re 9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Berry, 8 Motion to Strike filed by Robert Berry by Mountain Circle Family Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stern, Heather) (Entered: 04/11/2023)
2023-04-1132REPLY by Robert Berry re 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Kohls, Daniel) (Entered: 04/11/2023)
2023-04-1333REPLY re 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Coddington, Valerie Peters, Aiden Rossington, Alex Rossington, Shauna Rossington. (Licea Chavez, V) (Entered: 04/14/2023)
2023-04-1434ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 04/14/23 ORDERING the following: 31 Plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal is NOT ACCEPTED and this action is not dismissed on Plaintiffs' Notice; DENYING as unnecessary 12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend; Clerk to FILE 12 Plaintiffs' proposed first amended complaint and Exhibits A through W, at pages 71-260, as of 03/29/23; Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' first amended complaint within 30 days; any renewed motion for remand shall be filed within 30 days; VACATING the 04/19/23 and 06/07/23 hearings; DENYING as unnecessary 30 Berry's Request for Remote Appearance. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 04/14/2023)
2023-04-14SERVICE BY MAIL: 34 Order served on Joseph Coddington, Valerie Peters, Aiden Rossington, Alex Rossington, Shauna Rossington. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 04/14/2023)
2023-04-2136MOTION to STRIKE First Amended Complaint by Robert Berry. Motion Hearing SET for 6/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in Redding before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Robert Berry)(Kohls, Daniel) Modified on 4/28/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-2137DECLARATION by all of Plaintiffs to augment the accepted Amended Complaint. (Vij, M) Modified on 5/2/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 04/24/2023)
2023-05-0138MOTION to REMAND by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Shauna Rossington, # 2 Declaration Alex Rossington, # 3 Declaration Aiden Rossington, # 4 Declaration Joseph Coddington, # 5 Declaration Valerie Peters, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Proof of Service) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 05/02/2023)
2023-05-0339SECOND 40 OPPOSITION by All Plaintiffs to 36 Motion to Strike. (Benson, A.) Modified on 5/10/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 05/04/2023)
2023-05-1041OPPOSITION by Robert Berry to 38 Motion to Remand,. (Kohls, Daniel) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-1142REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC/REMOTE APPEARANCE at 6/7/23 hearing by All Plaintiffs. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-1243REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC/REMOTE APPEARANCE at 6/7/23 hearing filed by Robert Berry. (Stern, Heather) Modified on 5/15/2023 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-1244REPLY by Robert Berry to 36 Motion to Strike. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Berry, # 2 Notice)(Kohls, Daniel) Modified on 5/15/2023 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-1545MOTION to DISMISS by Angie Carpenter, Pamela Crespin, Shannon Doung, Justin Miller, Mountain Circle Family Service, Inc., Bill Powers, Kacey Reynolds, Katherine Van Dolsen. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Dahl, Sonja) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
2023-05-1546RESPONSE by Angie Carpenter, Pamela Crespin, Shannon Doung, Justin Miller, Mountain Circle Family Service, Inc., Bill Powers, Kacey Reynolds, Katherine Van Dolsen to 38 Motion to Remand. (Dahl, Sonja) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
2023-05-1647NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on 45 Motion to Dismiss, : Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Dahl, Sonja) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
2023-05-1749REPLY by All Plaintiffs to 36 Motion to Strike. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
2023-05-1750REPLY by All Plaintiffs in support of 38 Motion to Remand. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
2023-05-1848ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 05/17/2023 RESETTING the 36 Motion to Strike and 38 Motion to Remand to 6/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The 42 and 43 Parties' Request for remote appearances, are construed to seek remote appearances on 06/21/2023, and will be addressed separately in advance of that hearing. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 05/18/2023)
2023-05-18SERVICE BY MAIL: 48 Order served on Joseph Coddington, Valerie Peters, Aiden Rossington, Alex Rossington, Shauna Rossington. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 05/18/2023)
2023-05-1851REPLY by Plaintiffs to 46 Response. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar