Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01060
Date Filed2023-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning communications between nine named DOI employees and Somah Haaland from the email address somah.haaland@gmail.com. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10003257) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA DOI-OS-2023-001622, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - Department of the Interior Solicitor)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 04/17/2023)
2023-04-172NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. Case related to Case No. 1:23-cv-01058. (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 04/17/2023)
2023-04-17Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsl) (Entered: 04/17/2023)
2023-04-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 04/17/2023)
2023-05-174ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-19MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/19/2023. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar