Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-04-17 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10003511) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA DOI-OS-2023-001625, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - Department of the Interior Solicitor)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 04/17/2023) |
2023-04-17 | | Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb) (Entered: 04/17/2023) |
2023-04-17 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 04/17/2023) |
2023-04-18 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 18, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/18/2023) |
2023-05-17 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-31 | 5 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-06-01 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, in light of their 5 Joint Status Report, to file another joint status report by July 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 1, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-06-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 06/02/2023) |
2023-07-11 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-07-11 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by September 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 11, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-07-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 7 | NOTICE by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 8 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-09-13 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/13/2023) |
2023-09-14 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 9 Joint Status Report, to file a joint status report by November 15, 2023, advising the Court of the status of this matter and whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 14, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/14/2023) |
2023-09-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2023 (mac) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-11-15 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/15/2023) |
2023-11-15 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 10 Joint Status Report, to file, by January 16, 2024, a joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 15, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/15/2023) |
2023-11-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 1/16/2024. (mac) (Entered: 11/15/2023) |
2024-01-16 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/16/2024) |
2024-01-16 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 11 Joint Status Report, to file, by March 18, 2024, a joint status letter, advising the Court of the status of this matter and whether any disputes remain, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 16, 2024. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/16/2024) |
2024-01-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Letter due by 3/18/2024 (mac) (Entered: 01/17/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |