Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerica First Policy Institute v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityFort Worth
Case Number4:2023cv00369
Date Filed2023-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reed C. O'Connor
PlaintiffAmerica First Policy Institute
Case DescriptionAmerica First Policy Institute submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning the handling of their FOIA requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. However, when the agency failed to respond appropriately AFPI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-171COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services filed by America First Policy Institute. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13668577) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements and Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Steinmann, Jessica) (Entered: 04/17/2023)
2023-04-172CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by America First Policy Institute. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Steinmann, Jessica) (Entered: 04/17/2023)
2023-04-183New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (saw) (Entered: 04/18/2023)
2023-04-184Summons issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (saw) (Entered: 04/18/2023)
2023-04-195ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff America First Policy Institute. (Steinmann, Jessica) (Entered: 04/19/2023)
2023-05-016NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann for H. Dustin Fillmore III on behalf of America First Policy Institute. (Steinmann, Jessica) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar