Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01073
Date Filed2023-04-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning waiver provided excusing officials from their obligation under the Biden administration's ethics pledge. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10006959) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA 22-F-1039, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - DoD GC)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 04/18/2023)
2023-04-19Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zcb) (Entered: 04/19/2023)
2023-04-192SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 04/19/2023)
2023-04-193STANDARD ORDER for civil cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 19, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar