Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Immigrant Justice Center v. Department of Homeland Security
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2023cv02397
Date Filed2023-04-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Edmond E. Chang
PlaintiffNational Immigrant Justice Center
Case DescriptionThe National Immigrant Justice Center submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the agreement between DHS and the government of Mexico in which the United States and Mexico agreed to return Venezuelans seeking to enter the United States from Mexico. NIJC also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. NIJC submitted a second FOIA request broadening its first request and asking for expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NIJC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-181COMPLAINT filed by National Immigrant Justice Center; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20549473. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fleming, Mark) (Entered: 04/18/2023)
2023-04-18CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, ) (Entered: 04/18/2023)
2023-04-18CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached Consent To form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kra, ) (Entered: 04/18/2023)
2023-04-20SUMMONS Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (smb, ) (Entered: 04/20/2023)
2023-05-102MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 06/09/2023 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 06/01/2023. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If Defendant and appropriate governmental agencies have not been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 05/10/2023)
2023-05-153SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to Department of Homeland Security served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/11/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fleming, Mark) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 5/17/2023 (aee, ). (Entered: 05/15/2023)
2023-05-154SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fleming, Mark) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
2023-05-155SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fleming, Mark) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
2023-05-226DESIGNATION of William McHenry Strom as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Department of Homeland Security (Strom, William) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar