Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-04-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-10012879) filed by BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for USAO, # 3 Summons for State Dept., # 4 Summons for Legal Adviser, # 5 Summons for Attorney General)(Bader, Hans) Modified on 4/20/2023 to add receipt information (rj). (Entered: 04/20/2023) |
2023-04-20 | | Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsl) (Entered: 04/20/2023) |
2023-04-20 | 2 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 04/20/2023) |
2023-05-02 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/20/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/20/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/26/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/26/2023. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 05/02/2023) |
2023-05-24 | 4 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Nunc Pro Tunc by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 05/24/2023) |
2023-05-24 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by L'Shauntee J. Robertson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 05/24/2023) |
2023-05-26 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Defendant's Answer is due on June 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on May 26, 2023. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 05/26/2023) |
2023-06-12 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 06/12/2023) |
2023-06-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by June 29, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on June 15, 2023. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 06/15/2023) |
2023-06-29 | 7 | STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 06/29/2023) |
2023-06-29 | 8 | STATUS REPORT in response to the Court's June 15 order to submit a joint proposed schedule by BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 06/29/2023) |
2023-07-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Parties disagree as to the appropriate processing rate of records that are potentially responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Plaintiff requests that the records be processed at a rate of 500 pages per month, ECF 8, while Defendant requests that the records be processed at a rate of 450 pages per every six months, ECF 7. In most other FOIA cases, records are processed at a rate of 500 pages per month. Because Defendant has not shown why this case warrants a slower processing rate, the Court ORDERS Defendant to process 500 pages per month. The Parties may re-raise the processing rate issue if needed. The Parties are further ORDERED to submit a status report on October 5, 2023, and every 90 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on July 7, 2023. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-10-04 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-11-30 | 10 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 11/30/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |