Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of Florida et al v. Food and Drug Administration et al
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityTampa
Case Number8:2023cv00877
Date Filed2023-04-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas P. Barber
PlaintiffState of Florida
PlaintiffFlorida Agency for Health Care Administration
Case DescriptionThe State of Florida submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning Florida's SIP proposal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Florida filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFood and Drug Administration
DefendantDepartment of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-211COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20749541) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Summons)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-212NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:23-cv-877-TPB-TGW. (ARC) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-213STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/21/2023. (ABC) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-244SUMMONS issued as to Department of Health and Human Services, Food and Drug Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LSS) (Entered: 04/24/2023)
2023-04-245NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS) (Entered: 04/24/2023)
2023-04-246NOTICE TO COUNSEL R. Trent McCotter Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS) (Entered: 04/24/2023)
2023-04-257Unopposed MOTION for R. Trent McCotter to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20760882 for $150 by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. (McCotter, R.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 04/25/2023)
2023-04-258Unopposed MOTION for Jared M. Kelson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20760919 for $150 by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. (McCotter, R.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 04/25/2023)
2023-04-269ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/26/2023. (ABC) (Entered: 04/26/2023)
2023-04-2610ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/26/2023. (ABC) (Entered: 04/26/2023)
2023-04-2611NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by R. Trent McCotter on behalf of Florida Agency for Health Care Administration. Lead Counsel: R. Trent McCotter. (McCotter, R.) (Entered: 04/26/2023)
2023-04-2712PROOF of service by Florida Agency for Health Care Administration, State of Florida (McCotter, R.) (Entered: 04/27/2023)
2023-05-0113NOTICE of hearing: Case Management Conference set for JUNE 28, 2023, at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. (SRC) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-0114NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Christmas on behalf of State of Florida (Christmas, Natalie) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
2023-05-0515NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-05-0516NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) (Entered: 05/05/2023)
2023-05-1117NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 6/28/2023 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: MAY 31, 2023, at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. (SRC) (Entered: 05/11/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar