Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-04-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10016529) filed by MID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-21 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-21 | 3 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/21/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-05-08 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General May 1, 2023. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Main Document 4 flattened and replaced on 5/9/2023.) (ztnr) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-05-08 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/2/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/1/2023. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Main Document 5 flattened and replaced on 5/9/2023.) (ztnr) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-05-08 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/1/2023 (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Main Document 6 flattened and replaced on 5/9/2023.) (ztnr) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-05-17 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-22 | 8 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond (with Partial Consent) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/22/2023) |
2023-05-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before June 22, 2023. No further extensions shall be granted absent exceptional circumstances. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/23/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 05/23/2023) |
2023-06-22 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/22/2023) |
2023-06-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before July 26, 2023, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear by video for an Initial Scheduling Conference to be held via Zoom on August 3, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/23/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 06/23/2023) |
2023-07-26 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-07-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 8, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for August 3, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/27/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/27/2023) |
2023-09-08 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/08/2023) |
2023-09-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a further joint status report on or before October 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/9/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/09/2023) |
2023-10-27 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by MID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
2023-10-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a further joint status report on or before December 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/27/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
2023-12-15 | 13 | STATUS REPORT by MID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/15/2023) |
2023-12-15 | 14 | STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/15/2023) |
2023-12-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's status report, Dkt. 13 , and the Defendant's status report, Dkt. 14 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before January 31, 2024, addressing the parties' respective positions on whether a briefing schedule for dispositive motions is an appropriate next step. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/16/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/16/2023) |
2024-01-31 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by MID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-01-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a further joint status report on or before February 29, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/31/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-02-21 | 16 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Student Certification by MID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/21/2024) |
2024-02-22 | 17 | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Law Student Certification, Dkt. 16 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/22/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/22/2024) |
2024-02-29 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by MID-ATLANTIC INNOCENCE PROJECT. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/29/2024) |
2024-03-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 18 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant will provide search declarations and Vaughn indices, if any, to Plaintiff on or before March 27, 2024. It is further ORDERED that a pre-motion conference is scheduled for April 4, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. In advance of that hearing, the Defendant will file its pre-motion statement on or before March 27, 2024; Plaintiff will file its response on or before April 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/4/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/04/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |