Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-04-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10017215) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to AG, USAO, and Agency Counsel)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zcb) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-21 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-22 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 04/22/2023) |
2023-05-17 | 4 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-17 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on or before June 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/17/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-06-12 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/12/2023) |
2023-06-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before June 27, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/13/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/13/2023) |
2023-06-27 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/27/2023) |
2023-06-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 6 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 28, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/27/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/27/2023) |
2023-06-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/28/2023 (tj) (Entered: 06/28/2023) |
2023-07-28 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-07-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 26, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/28/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-09-26 | 8 | STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |