Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv01114
Date Filed2023-04-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ana C. Reyes
PlaintiffENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionEnergy Policy Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning correspondence with three officials in which the correspondence is with or mentions the email domain of various outside entities including environmental and/or lobbying groups. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-04-211COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10017350) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proposed to AG, US Attorney, and Defendant, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-21Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zrtw) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-212SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-223NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 04/22/2023)
2023-04-294NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2023)
2023-05-195ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar